+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1326 is now Act 320
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No.1 read and objected to.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Wright
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor