+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1295 is now Act 234
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Gillam
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor