+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1293 is now Act 1170
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reassigned and transfer to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Leding
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Leding
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
March 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor