+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as requested.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as requested.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Motion by Representative DeAnn Vaught to recall HB1293 from the Senate passed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Vaught
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor