+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1284 is now Act 71
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Moore
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 7, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
February 3, 2011: Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (81)
Type:
Primary Sponsor