+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Leding
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Leding
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor