+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1275 is now Act 427
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by S. Smith
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
March 16, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor