+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1274 is now Act 534
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 15, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
March 14, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 11