+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1264 is now Act 546
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Pilkington
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Pilkington
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
February 15, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor