+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1246 is now Act 207
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor