+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1241 is now Act 69
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor