+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1234 is now Act 1450
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Williams
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 16, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor