+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1230 is now Act 128
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor