+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1226 is now Act 1101
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
- Motion to place HB1226 on second reading for the purpose of amendment failed.
- Read the third time and failed.
- Motion to place HB1226 on second reading for purpose of amendment failed.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by
+ − Votes (8)
April 1, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 9
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 6
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 10
March 30, 2011: Motion to place HB1226 on second reading for the purpose of amendment failed.
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 7
March 30, 2011: Motion to place HB1226 on second reading for purpose of amendment failed.
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 3
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 5
March 24, 2011: Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 8