+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1224 is now Act 1072
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor