+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1223 is now Act 604
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor