+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1222 is now Act 15
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 3