+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1221 is now Act 780
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Dotson
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor