+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1219 is now Act 753
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The vote by which HB1219 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 9
March 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor