+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1211 is now Act 829
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Dotson
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Dotson
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
March 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor