+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1205 is now Act 1448
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Nickels
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Nickels
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Nickels
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
April 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 29
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor