+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1190 is now Act 105
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Hammer
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor