+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1182 is now Act 288
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by M. Pitsch
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 9
February 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor