+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 5 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 & 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment H5
Sponsored by House
Amendment H4
Sponsored by House
Amendment H3
Sponsored by House
Amendment H2
Sponsored by House
Amendment H1
Sponsored by House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor