+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1172 is now Act 332
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Tosh
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
February 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
January 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor