+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1171 is now Act 1206
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Kerr
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 2, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor