+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 15, 2021 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Tollett
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Tollett
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor