+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1163 is now Act 102
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 6, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor