+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1160 is now Act 766
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
- The vote by which HB1160 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
+ − Votes (3)
March 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 3
March 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 18
March 8, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 37
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor