+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1158 is now Act 224
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor