+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Notification that HB1158 is now Act 289
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Motion to reconsider Amendment #1 passed.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment No. 1 failed of adoption.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2014: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2014: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor