+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1152 is now Act 68
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately returned to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Received from the House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Boyd
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4