+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Notification that HB1147 is now Act 286
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2012: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2012: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5