+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1147 is now Act 131
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Boyd
Amendment H1
Sponsored by T. Garner
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor