+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1143 is now Act 137
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lenderman
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 22, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor