+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1141 is now Act 29
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Aging, Children and Youth, Legislative & Military Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 27, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor