+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1137 is now Act 493
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Collins-Smith
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Ladyman
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
March 7, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 7, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor