+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1136 is now Act 493
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lenderman
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 13, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor