+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1127 is now Act 528
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Baltz
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2015: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
March 10, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor