+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1126 is now Act 301
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Evans
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 21, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5