+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Notification that HB1126 is now Act 226
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2018: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (128)
Type:
Primary Sponsor