+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1120 is now Act 42
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 3, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor