+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1119 is now Act 1046
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 17
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Present/NV: 20