+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1118 is now Act 1166
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Files
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Pennartz
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Pennartz
Amendment H4
Sponsored by Pennartz
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Pennartz
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2011: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 26
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 9, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor