+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1112 is now Act 249
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lowery
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor