+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1105 is now Act 320
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor