+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1100 is now Act 72
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by B. Wilkins
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor