+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1098 is now Act 342
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by B. Wilkins
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 3, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 4