+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1087 is now Act 718
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16