+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1082 is now Act 156
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 5